Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Susan H. Mcgowan Revocable Trust, filed a(n) General Property - Property case against Entergy Arkansas, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Hot Spring County, AR, . Hot Spring County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2023 |
CategoryQt - Real Property - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHot Spring County, AR |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | ENTRY OF APPEARANCE | |
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | ENTRY OF APPEARANCE | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE - OTHER | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | MOF ORIGINAL | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $ | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.