Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Taylor, Vanessa S, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Weaver, Tad, in the jurisdiction of Hot Spring County, AR, . Hot Spring County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2022 |
CategoryOc - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHot Spring County, AR |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION CONTINUANCE | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO APPEAR | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION CITATION/CONTEMPT | |
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT-DEFAULT | |
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | AOC DISPOSITION SHEET | |
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER | |
June 19, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER MOTION GRANTED | |
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT FILED | |
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO MOTION FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.