Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Do - Seller Plaintiff (Debt Coll.) case against Buckner, Tammy, in the jurisdiction of Hot Spring County, AR, . Hot Spring County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2022 |
CategoryDo - Seller Plaintiff (Debt Coll.) |
Last RefreshedAugust 15, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHot Spring County, AR |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT FILED | |
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | WARNING ORDER ISSUED BY CLERK | |
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OTHER | |
February 04, 2023 | Docket Event | FILING - OTHER | |
February 04, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION OTHER | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | MOF ORIGINAL | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.