Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Do - Seller Plaintiff (Debt Coll.) case against Barham, Kelley G, in the jurisdiction of Hot Spring County, AR, . Hot Spring County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2022 |
CategoryDo - Seller Plaintiff (Debt Coll.) |
Last RefreshedAugust 14, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHot Spring County, AR |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE | |
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT-DEFAULT | |
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT FILED | |
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER EXTENSION OF TIME | |
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION EXTENSION OF TIME | |
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED | |
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event | MOF ORIGINAL | |
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.