Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Kemp, Linda Ann, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Drew County, AR, . Drew County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2022 |
CategoryDe - Decedent Estate Administration |
Last RefreshedAugust 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationDrew County, AR |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITION | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | ACCOUNTING BY PERSONAL REP$ | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event | INVENTORY OF DECEDENT'S ESTATE | |
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event | LETTERS TESTAMENTARY | |
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT | |
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event | ACCEPT APPT PERSONAL REP | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | WAIVER | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | AOC COVERSHEET REOPEN PROBATE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.