Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Ryburn, Gloria J, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Drew County, AR, . Drew County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 28, 2022 |
CategoryDe - Decedent Estate Administration |
Last RefreshedAugust 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationDrew County, AR |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | WAIVER | |
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | WAIVER | |
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | WAIVER | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE APPT EXECUTOR/TRIX | |
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | ACCEPT APPOINTMENT | |
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OTHER | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | PETITION | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | AOC COVERSHEET REOPEN PROBATE | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | MOF ORIGINAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.