Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Office Of Child Support Enforcement, filed a(n) Ss - Support - Ocse case against Tacker, Holly, in the jurisdiction of Drew County, AR, . Drew County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2022 |
CategorySs - Support - Ocse |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDrew County, AR |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER ON MTN CONTINUE | |
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER ON MTN CONTINUE | |
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event | EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED | |
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event | MOF ORIGINAL | |
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event | CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION SHEET | |
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event | AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.