Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Miller, Jason, filed a(n) Da - Order Of Protection case against Ballentine, Krisi, in the jurisdiction of Drew County, AR, . Drew County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2022 |
CategoryDa - Order Of Protection |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDrew County, AR |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event | MOD DISMISSED | |
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT-DISMISS W/O PREJUDICE | |
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event | AOC DISPOSITION SHEET | |
January 04, 2023 | Hearing |
ORDER OF PROTECTION HEARING
Judge: 10TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 2 |
|
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER EX PARTE | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | PET ORDER OF PROTECTION | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.