Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Williamson, Tamara, filed a(n) Da - Order Of Protection case against Derryberry, Billy L, in the jurisdiction of Drew County, AR, . Drew County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 01, 2022 |
CategoryDa - Order Of Protection |
Last RefreshedAugust 08, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDrew County, AR |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT-DISMISS | |
February 08, 2023 | Hearing |
ORDER OF PROTECTION HEARING
Judge: 10TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 2 |
|
February 03, 2023 | Hearing |
ORDER OF PROTECTION HEARING
Judge: 10TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 2 |
|
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER | |
January 04, 2023 | Hearing |
ORDER OF PROTECTION HEARING
Judge: 10TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 2 |
|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER EX PARTE | |
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | PET ORDER OF PROTECTION | |
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | MOF ORIGINAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.