Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Johnson, Jarrett Scott, filed a(n) Da - Order Of Protection case against Hass, Alyson A, in the jurisdiction of Drew County, AR, . Drew County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 29, 2022 |
CategoryDa - Order Of Protection |
Last RefreshedAugust 08, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDrew County, AR |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event | MOD DISMISSED | |
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OTHER | |
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event | AOC DISPOSITION SHEET | |
January 04, 2023 | Hearing |
ORDER OF PROTECTION HEARING
Judge: 10TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 2 |
|
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | PET ORDER OF PROTECTION | |
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER | |
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.