Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Office Of Child Support Enforcement, filed a(n) Ss - Support - Ocse case against Jones, Walter Alan, in the jurisdiction of Drew County, AR, . Drew County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 08, 2022 |
CategorySs - Support - Ocse |
Last RefreshedAugust 08, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDrew County, AR |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | OCSE WAGE NOTICE | |
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT-DEFAULT | |
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event | AOC DISPOSITION SHEET | |
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event | MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SERVED | |
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED | |
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.