Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Interurban Walnut Creek Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Dodds, Constance D, in the jurisdiction of Drew County, AR, . Drew County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2023 |
CategoryUd - Landlord/Tenant Unlawfuldetain |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDrew County, AR |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION | |
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT-OTHER | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT FILED | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SERVED | |
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE - OTHER | |
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED | |
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event | MOF ORIGINAL | |
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event | AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.