Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Leonard, Cheyann Nicole, filed a(n) Da - Order Of Protection case against Dallas, Dale, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, AR, . Clay County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 03, 2022 |
CategoryDa - Order Of Protection |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationClay County, AR |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | EX PARTE HEARING CONTINUED | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF PROTECT HEARING CONTD | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SERVED | |
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event | OTHER HEARING CONTINUED | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER EX PARTE | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | FILING - OTHER | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT FILED | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | PET ORDER OF PROTECTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.