Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Walker, Adrianna Nicole, filed a(n) Da - Order Of Protection case against Kilbreth, Jonathan D, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, AR, . Clay County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 20, 2022 |
CategoryDa - Order Of Protection |
Last RefreshedAugust 15, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationClay County, AR |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OTHER | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | MOD DISMISSED | |
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER ON MTN CONTINUE | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER ON MTN CONTINUE | |
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION HEARING CONTINUED | |
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER PETITION DENIED | |
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event | FILING - OTHER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.