Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Catterton, Janet, filed a(n) Om - Civil - Other case against Brown, Chastidy, Miller, Terry, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, AR, . Clay County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 29, 2022 |
CategoryOm - Civil - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationClay County, AR |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO MOTION FILED | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION COMPEL | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | BRIEF FILED | |
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONSE/REPLY | |
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM COURT | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO MOTION | |
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SERVED | |
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.