Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against James, Tamra, Palacios Enterprises, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, AR, . Clay County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 09, 2022 |
CategoryNm - Automobile Tort |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClay County, AR |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | AOC DISPOSITION SHEET | |
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | MOD DISMISSED | |
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO DISMISS | |
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION DISMISS | |
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OTHER | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NON - EST. | |
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event | AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL | |
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event | CV COMPLAINT FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.