Case Last Refreshed: 23 hours ago
Jimenez, Patricia J., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Quintana, Alvaro Luis F., in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts 395th Judicial District Court with Larson, Ryan D. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLarson, Ryan D. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House395th Judicial District Court |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Final Decree Of Divorce |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Agreed Final Decree of Divorce | |
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Statement | |
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Rule 11 Agreement | |
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Vacation | |
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Vacation | |
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Vacation | |
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Original Answer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.