Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Szodoray, Zsuzsanna, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Miller, Jeffrey, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Betsy F. Lambeth presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBetsy F. Lambeth Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce (No Children) |
Last RefreshedMay 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Order | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Qualified Domestic Relations Order | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing to Enter Order (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Lambeth, Betsy F.) | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Enter | |
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Exhibit List | |
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion | |
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Docket Entry by Judge Betsy Lambeth | |
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Agreed Final Decree of Divorce |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.