Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Es Austin Propco, Llc, filed a(n) Other - Civil case represented by Robert E. Pernai, against Williamson Central Appraisal District, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Larson, Ryan D. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLarson, Ryan D. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryOther - Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Agreed Judgment | |
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant's Original Answer | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation by Certified Mail Williamson Central Appraisal District Served 09/08/2021 Returned 09/13/2021 | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Information Sheet | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Issuance | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Request |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.