Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hall Schwarz, Rochelle, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Daniel J Christensen, against Gomez Zuazua, Beatrice, Patel, Rajnikant, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Lambeth, Betsy F. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLambeth, Betsy F. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryDamage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeNotice Of Non-Suit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Nonsuit Mailed | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Nonsuit | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Nonsuit | |
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Nonsuit Mailed | |
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Nonsuit | |
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Citation Germania Local Chapter Served 08/08/2022 Returned 08/17/2022 Germania General Agency, Inc Served 08/08/2022 Returned 08/17/2022 | |
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event | First Amended | |
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Issuance | |
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Intention to Take Deposition by Written Questions |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.