Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lodge Multifamily Austin Lp, filed a(n) Other - Civil case represented by Amy Reilly Sallusti, against Williamson Central Appraisal District, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Larson, Ryan D. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLarson, Ryan D. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2021 |
CategoryOther - Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder Granting Non-Suit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Granting Nonsuit | |
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Nonsuit Mailed | |
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Nonsuit | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant's Original Answer | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Williamson Central Appraisal District Served 09/03/2021 Returned 09/03/2021 | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Issuance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.