Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Association Of West Ridge Owners, Inc., filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Matthew W. Mcphail, against Garza, Federico, Garza, Veronica, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Larson, Ryan D. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLarson, Ryan D. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Case Outcome TypeNotice Of Non-Suit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Nonsuit Mailed | |
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Nonsuit | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Garza, Federico Served 09/03/2021 Returned 09/03/2021 Garza, Veronica Served 09/03/2021 Returned 09/03/2021 | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Issuance | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Garza, Federico Unserved Garza, Veronica Unserved |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.