Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
American Builders & Contractors Supply Co., Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by W Jason Walker, against Jankiji Inc., Rodriguez, Rene, Rrr Consulting & Restorations, Llc D B A Vantage Roofing, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Larson, Ryan D. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLarson, Ryan D. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2021 |
CategoryDebt/Contract - Debt/Contract |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Return Mail | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued | |
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Writ RRR Consulting & Restorations, LLC Returned Unserved 12/16/2022 Returned 12/16/2022 Rodriguez, Rene Returned Unserved 12/16/2022 Returned 12/16/2022 | |
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Issuance | |
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Default Judgment | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion for Default Judgment | |
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.