Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Cft Nv Developments, Llc, filed a(n) Other - Civil case represented by Clemetric Frazier, against Williamson Central Appraisal District, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Lambeth, Betsy F. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLambeth, Betsy F. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 30, 2021 |
CategoryOther - Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing to Enter Order By Order CANCELED Hearing to Enter Order (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Lambeth, Betsy F.) By Order |
|
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Agreed Judgment | |
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Letter | |
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Rule 11 Agreement | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant's Original Answer | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Williamson Central Appraisal District Served 10/12/2021 Returned 10/22/2021 | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Issuance | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.