Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cruz, Christian, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Pierce P Macguire, against Cruz, Benjamin, Jr., Cruz, Benjamin, Sr., in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Larson, Ryan D. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLarson, Ryan D. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 27, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
November 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Order to Dismiss | |
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer And Counter | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Issuance | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Cruz, Benjamin, Jr. Unserved Cruz, Benjamin, Sr. Unserved | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.