Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bergman, Wendy, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Neil Solomon, against Charter Logistics Usa, Inc., Youssif-Jan, Saif Adhab-Dheyaa, represented by P Clark Aspy, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 26, 2021 |
CategoryDamage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Removal (Disposes Case in Dist Court) | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant's Original Answer | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury Demand | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Youssif-Jan, Saif Adhab-Dheyaa Served 08/27/2021 Returned 08/30/2021 Charter Logistics USA, Inc. Served 08/27/2021 Returned 08/30/2021 | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Issuance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.