Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ordonez, Florentina, Ordonez, Ricardo, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Andres Eduardo Guerra, against Bazemore, Stephon, Twin Liquors, Lp, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Lambeth, Betsy F. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLambeth, Betsy F. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 26, 2021 |
CategoryDamage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeNotice Of Non-Suit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Nonsuit Mailed | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Nonsuit | |
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice | |
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Entry Of Appearance | |
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Rule 11 Agreement | |
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury Demand | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Answer | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Return of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.