Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Raymond, Concetta, Raymond, Doug, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Dan M Gattis, against Frontier Communications Corporation, Garman, Donald, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Field, Scott K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeField, Scott K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 24, 2021 |
CategoryDamage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Case Dismissed CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Field, Scott K.) Case Dismissed |
|
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Hearing Case Dismissed CANCELED Pre-Trial Hearing (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Field, Scott K.) Case Dismissed |
|
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Order to Dismiss | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Agreed Motion | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Discovery Control Plan | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Transfer Order to the 480th District Court | |
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Vacation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.