Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Texas Rock Solid Building Services, Llc, filed a(n) Other - Civil case represented by Paul Matthew O'Neil, against Westport Group, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Lambeth, Betsy F. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLambeth, Betsy F. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 17, 2021 |
CategoryOther - Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Dismissal Mailed | |
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Order to Dismiss | |
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing By Order CANCELED Final Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Lambeth, Betsy F.) By Order |
|
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Trial and Dismissal Docket | |
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Lambeth, Betsy F.) | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Retain | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Trial Setting | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant's Original Answer | |
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation by Certified Mail Westport Group, Inc. Served 08/03/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.