Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The Villages Of Berry Creek Owners Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by George V Basham, Iii, against Gale, Griffith Wayne, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Lambeth, Betsy F. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLambeth, Betsy F. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 17, 2021 |
CategoryForeclosure - Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeNotice Of Non-Suit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Nonsuit Mailed | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Nonsuit | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Gale, Griffith Wayne Served 06/21/2021 Returned 06/23/2021 | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Issuance | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.