Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Austin Community College, Leander Independent School District, The City Of Leander, Texas, The County Of Williamson, Texas, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Craig Morgan, against Crystal Falls Home Owner'S Association, Inc., Runge, Edward, Runge, Patricia, Runge, Royce, Runge, Victoria, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Larson, Ryan D. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLarson, Ryan D. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 25, 2021 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal Without Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Order to Dismiss | |
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion | |
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing on Tax Case (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Larson, Ryan D.) | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Runge, Victoria Served 09/20/2021 Returned 09/24/2021 | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Runge, Royce Served 09/17/2021 Returned 09/24/2021 | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Crystal Falls Home Owner's Association, Inc. Served 09/13/2021 Returned 09/20/2021 | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Runge, Patricia Served 09/29/2021 Returned 10/21/2021 | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Runge, Edward Served 09/29/2021 Returned 10/21/2021 | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.