Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Warwick, Debra Gail, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Warwick, Curtis Oscar, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 07, 2001 |
CategoryDivorce (No Children) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Final Decree Of Divorce |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2001 | Docket Event | Qualified Domestic Relations Order | |
February 23, 2001 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
February 07, 2001 | Docket Event | Mediated Settlement Agreement | |
December 11, 2000 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
December 05, 2000 | Docket Event | Original Answer | |
November 20, 2000 | Docket Event |
Petitioner's Original Petition (OCA) Vol./Book , Page Vol./Book , Page |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.