Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, Na, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Thomas Sellers, against Brown, David M., represented by Carl Arthur Smart, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Larson, Ryan D. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLarson, Ryan D. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2021 |
CategoryDebt/Contract - Debt/Contract |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Release of Judgment | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Return Mail | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Agreed Judgment | |
February 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant's Original Answer | |
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Brown, David M. Served 01/20/2021 Returned 01/21/2021 | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Brown, David M. Unserved | |
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Issuance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.