Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The Homeowners' Association For Chandler Creek, Inc., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Devin Lyn Knox, against Garcia, Gonzalo, Garcia, Justine, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Lambeth, Betsy F. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLambeth, Betsy F. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2021 |
CategoryForeclosure - Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Order of Sale Issued | |
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Order of Sale The Homeowners' Association for Chandler Creek, Inc. Returned Unserved 09/06/2022 Returned 09/06/2022 | |
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Issuance | |
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Final Judgment | |
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion for Default Judgment | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket Notice Mailed | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Garcia, Gonzalo Served 01/14/2021 Returned 01/20/2021 Garcia, Justine Served 01/14/2021 Returned 01/20/2021 | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.