Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Austin Community College, Leander Independent School District, The County Of Williamson, Texas, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Craig Morgan, against Kettner, Christine, Noya, Zoila, Rodriguez, Max, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Lambeth, Betsy F. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLambeth, Betsy F. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2021 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Publication | |
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Order of Sale Return | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Order of Sale Issued | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Certified | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing on Tax Case (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Lambeth, Betsy F.) | |
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Last Known Address | |
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Secretary State of Texas SERVED to: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.