Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Evans, Michele O'Brien, filed a(n) Other - Civil case represented by Kathryn Figueredo Fowler, against Evans, Lucas Dean, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Lambeth, Betsy F. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLambeth, Betsy F. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2021 |
CategoryOther - Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Order | |
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Lambeth, Betsy F.) | |
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion for Nonsuit | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Evans, Lucas Dean Served 01/13/2021 Returned 01/13/2021 | |
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Issuance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.