Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Georgetown Independent School District, The City Of Georgetown, Texas, The County Of Williamson, Texas, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Craig Morgan, against Bbva Usa, Morales, Jessica, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Lambeth, Betsy F. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLambeth, Betsy F. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2021 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer | |
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Dismissal Mailed | |
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Order to Dismiss | |
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Tax Case Other CANCELED Hearing on Tax Case (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Lambeth, Betsy F.) Other |
|
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Last Known Address | |
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Morales, Jessica Served 05/13/2021 | |
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | E-Filed Tax Citation (for issuance) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.