Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hutto Independent School District, The County Of Williamson, Texas, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Craig Morgan, against Rivera, Gerardo, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Lambeth, Betsy F. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLambeth, Betsy F. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2021 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Dismissal Mailed | |
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Order to Dismiss | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Rivera, Gerardo Served 02/03/2021 Returned 02/22/2021 | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Tax Case - Business Personal Property | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.