Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Campos, Juan Carlos, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Crystal Wright, against Overstreet, Jeremy, Ranger Ready Mix, Llc, represented by Joanna Lippman Salinas, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Ryan D. Larson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRyan D. Larson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2021 |
CategoryDamage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Larson, Ryan D.) 08/14/2023 Reset by Court to 04/01/2024 | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Conference Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Larson, Ryan D.) | |
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Deposition | |
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion for Protective Order | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Second Amended | |
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Amended | |
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Certification(s) | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Conference Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Larson, Ryan D.) | |
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Fourth Amended | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Certification(s) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.