Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Austin Community College, Leander Independent School District, The City Of Cedar Park, Texas, The County Of Williamson, Texas, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Craig Morgan, against Taparauskas, Linda A., Taparauskas, William J., Jr., in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Lambeth, Betsy F. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLambeth, Betsy F. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2021 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Dismissal Mailed | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Order to Dismiss | |
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Returned Unserved | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Taparauskas, William J., Jr. Returned Unserved 01/20/2021 Returned 01/20/2021 | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Taparauskas, Linda A. Served 01/21/2021 | |
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | E-Filed Tax Citation (for issuance) | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Tax Case - Real Property | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.