Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Austin Community College, Leander Independent School District, The City Of Cedar Park, Texas, The County Of Williamson, Texas, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Craig Morgan, against Alva, Jorge A., The Attorney General Of Texas, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Larson, Ryan D. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLarson, Ryan D. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2021 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing on Tax Case (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Larson, Ryan D.) | |
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Certified | |
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Last Known Address | |
February 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Answer | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation The Attorney General of Texas Served 01/26/2021 Returned 02/01/2021 | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Alva, Jorge A. Served 01/20/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.