Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Georgetown Independent School District, The City Of Georgetown, Texas, The County Of Williamson, Texas, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Connor Buchanan, against Valadez, Jose, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Lambeth, Betsy F. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLambeth, Betsy F. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2021 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing on Tax Case (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Lambeth, Betsy F.) | |
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Last Known Address | |
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Certified | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Valadez, Jose Served 01/19/2021 | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | E-Filed Tax Citation (for issuance) | |
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Tax Case - Business Personal Property | |
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.