Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Georgetown Independent School District, The County Of Williamson, Texas, Williamson County Emergency Services District #8, Williamson County Municipal Utility District #15, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Connor Buchanan, against Austin Drone Photography, Bonnet, Chris, Ramirez, Fred, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Larson, Ryan D. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLarson, Ryan D. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2021 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing on Tax Case (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officers Larson, Ryan D., Jergins, Michael P.) | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing on Tax Case (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officers Larson, Ryan D., Jergins, Michael P.) | |
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Last Known Address | |
March 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Secretary State of Texas SERVED to: | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice from TX SOS -rec'd citation Notice from TX SOS -rec'd citation |
|
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Travis Co #5 served Sec of State of TX | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Bonnet, Chris Served 01/21/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.