Case Last Refreshed: 23 minutes ago
Attorney General Of Texas filed a(n) Other Civil case in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts 98th District Court with MAUZY, CATHERINE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMAUZY, CATHERINE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 05, 2023 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedApril 17, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
|
Filing Court House98th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS RECEIPT 5411DC | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER MANDATE FROM 3RD COA | |
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL Party: Defendant CECILE ERWIN YOUNG EXECUTIVE COMMISSIONER OF THE TEXAS HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION; Defendant TEXAS HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION | |
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL | |
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE LETTER FROM 3RD COA | |
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE MEMORANDUM OPINION FROM 3RD COA | |
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER JUDGMENT FROM 3RD COA | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE LETTER FROM 3RD COA | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE TAMES EMAIL SUBMISSION OF CLERKS RECORD TO 3RD COA | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE BILL OF COST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.