Case Last Refreshed: 19 hours ago
Munoz , Luis Martinez, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Mares Jorge Luiz, against Flores , Juan, United Rentals Inc, United Rentals North America Inc, represented by Doyle Trek C., in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts 419th District Court with Catherine A. Mauzy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCatherine A. Mauzy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 27, 2020 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Other |
Last RefreshedApril 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House419th District Court |
This complaint is a First Amended Original Petition and Requests for Disclosure filed by Plaintiff Luis Martinez Munoz against Defendants Juan Flores, United Rentals, Inc., and United Rentals North America, Inc. The plaintiff alleges that on March 6,...
ORIG ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: May 01, 2020AMENDED PETITION/SUPPLEMENTAL
Date: May 08, 2020ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: March 27, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER (Judicial Officer: MAUZY, CATHERINE A) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event | CVD:DISMISSAL/NONSUIT (OCA) | |
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION AGREED MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE Party: Defendant UNITED RENTALS NORTH AMERICA INC; Plaintiff MUNOZ, LUIS MARTINEZ | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE RULE 203 CERTIFICATE - BRUSHY CREEK EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS PLL C Event Code: 5415 Party: Plaintiff MUNOZ, LUIS MARTINEZ | |
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE RULE 203 CERTIFICATE Event Code: 5415 | |
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE NOTICE OF FORWARDING PURSUANT TO CPRC 18.001(d)(1) Event Code: 5554 | |
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF FILING BUSINESS RECORDS Event Code: 5554 Party: Plaintiff MUNOZ, LUIS MARTINEZ | |
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | MTN:ABATE/STAY AGREED MOTION TO REFER TO ARBITRATION AND TO ABTE PROCEEDING S Event Code: 5270 Party: Defendant UNITED RENTALS NORTH AMERICA INC | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE RULE 203 CERTIFICATE-BAYLOR SCOTT & WHITE INSTITUTE FOR REHABILITATION-ROUND ROCK MEIDCAL RECORDS Event Code: 5415 | |
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE RULE 203 CERTIFICATE MELISSA D TONN, MD -BILLING Event Code: 5415 Party: Plaintiff MUNOZ, LUIS MARTINEZ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.