We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Travis County Vs Shorts

Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago

Travis County, Austin Independent School District, Austin Community College, City Of Austin, Travis County Healthcare District, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Beck Jack Elliott, against Chandler , Debra, Shorts , Barbara Kenya, Robinson , Cecilia, Shorts , Donald Ray, Shorts , Ruby Renea, (total of 8) See All represented by Shepherd Robb William, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .

Case Details for Travis County v. Chandler , Debra , et al.

Filing Date

September 11, 2014

Category

Travis County Tax (Gen Lit )

Last Refreshed

February 20, 2021

Practice Area

Tax

Filing Location

Travis County, TX

Matter Type

General Tax

Parties for Travis County v. Chandler , Debra , et al.

Plaintiffs

Travis County

Austin Independent School District

Austin Community College

City Of Austin

Travis County Healthcare District

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Beck Jack Elliott

Defendants

Chandler , Debra

Shorts , Barbara Kenya

Robinson , Cecilia

Shorts , Donald Ray

Shorts , Ruby Renea

Laveen , Patricia Michelle

Shorts , Robert Thomas

Shorts , Donna Faye

Attorneys for Defendants

Shepherd Robb William

Other Parties

City Of Austin (In Rem Only)

Mcafee , Lisa Michelle (In Rem Only)

Mosby Megan T. (Attorney)

Case Documents for Travis County v. Chandler , Debra , et al.

ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION

Date: September 11, 2014

AMENDED PETITION/SUPPLEMENTAL

Date: December 06, 2017

ORD:OTHER ORDER

Date: March 27, 2015

MTN:OTHER MOTION

Date: April 24, 2015

ORD:OTHER ORDER

Date: April 28, 2015

AMENDED PETITION/SUPPLEMENTAL

Date: October 11, 2016

ORD:JUDGMENT

Date: April 18, 2018

STATEMENT OF EVIDENCE

Date: April 18, 2018

ORDER OF SALE SIGNED & SEALED

Date: December 18, 2019

Case Events for Travis County v. Chandler , Debra , et al.

Type Description
Docket Event EXECUTED SERVICE
Docket Event RETURN OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT
Docket Event ORDER OF SALE SIGNED & SEALED
Docket Event OTHER FILING
Docket Event NTC:OTHER NOTICE
Docket Event NTC:OTHER NOTICE
Docket Event NTC:OTHER NOTICE
Docket Event ORD:JUDGMENT
Docket Event STATEMENT OF EVIDENCE
Docket Event ORIG ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE
See all events

Related Content in Travis County

Case

TRAVIS COUNTY vs. PALACIO MONARCA, LLC
Jul 08, 2024 | 261ST, DISTRICT COURT | Tax Delinquency | D-1-GN-24-004138

Case

TRAVIS COUNTY vs. KOTR RE, LLC
Jul 11, 2024 | 53RD, DISTRICT COURT | Tax Delinquency | D-1-GN-24-004275

Case

TRAVIS COUNTY vs. 1503 LOST CREEK BLVD., LLC
Jul 11, 2024 | 459TH, DISTRICT COURT | Tax Delinquency | D-1-GN-24-004274

Case

TRAVIS COUNTY vs. 2700 OAKHURST, LLC
Jul 11, 2024 | 126TH, DISTRICT COURT | Tax Delinquency | D-1-GN-24-004277

Case

TRAVIS COUNTY vs. JASON HUNT,KRISTIN HUNT
Jul 11, 2024 | 98TH, DISTRICT COURT | Tax Delinquency | D-1-GN-24-004276

Case

TRAVIS COUNTY vs. SARAH FORBES
Jul 08, 2024 | 419TH, DISTRICT COURT | Tax Delinquency | D-1-GN-24-004177

Case

TRAVIS COUNTY vs. THERMA-STAR, LLC
Jul 08, 2024 | 201ST, DISTRICT COURT | Tax Delinquency | D-1-GN-24-004136

Case

THE STATE OF TEXAS vs. TEXAS PRIME MOTORS INC.,FARHAD HEIDARI
Jul 12, 2024 | 53RD, DISTRICT COURT | Other Tax | D-1-GN-24-004311

Case

TRAVIS COUNTY vs. RENE RANGEL,YVETTE RANGEL
Jul 08, 2024 | 353RD, DISTRICT COURT | Tax Delinquency | D-1-GN-24-004140

Case

TRAVIS COUNTY vs. ENRIQUE FLORES
Jul 08, 2024 | 345TH, DISTRICT COURT | Tax Delinquency | D-1-GN-24-004175

Case

TRAVIS COUNTY vs. AP MCD HARPERS CREEK, LLC DBA HILLSIDE CREEK
Jul 08, 2024 | 455TH, DISTRICT COURT | Tax Delinquency | D-1-GN-24-004178

Case

TRAVIS COUNTY vs. ROBERT HARRISON
Jul 08, 2024 | 98TH, DISTRICT COURT | Tax Delinquency | D-1-GN-24-004181

Case

TRAVIS COUNTY vs. HOLLOW CREEK CONDOS, LLC
Jul 11, 2024 | 455TH, DISTRICT COURT | Tax Delinquency | D-1-GN-24-004273

Document

LOWES HOME CENTERS INC vs. HARRIS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT
Jul 12, 2024 | LAUREN REEDER | Tax Appraisal | Tax Appraisal | 202443660

Document

KOHL'S ILLINOIS INC et al vs. HARRIS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT
Jul 10, 2024 | URSULA A. HALL | Tax Appraisal | Tax Appraisal | 202443265

Document

SHELDON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT vs. HERNANDEZ, FELIX
Jul 12, 2024 | BRITTANYE MORRIS | TAX SUIT | TAX SUIT | 202443697

Document

CAMPBELL MARTIAL TRUST vs. HARRIS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT
Jul 12, 2024 | LATOSHA LEWIS PAYNE | Tax Appraisal | Tax Appraisal | 202443751

Document

ARON, JONATHAN W vs. HARRIS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT
Jul 05, 2024 | DAWN ROGERS | Tax Appraisal | Tax Appraisal | 202442856

Document

HART, RAYMOND P vs. HARRIS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT
Jul 08, 2024 | ELAINE H PALMER | Tax Appraisal | Tax Appraisal | 202442923

Document

ALLGOOD, CAROLIE A vs. HARRIS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT
Jul 11, 2024 | RAVI K. SANDILL | Tax Appraisal | Tax Appraisal | 202443434

Document

HEWLETT PACKARD ENTERPRISE CO vs. HARRIS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT
Jul 08, 2024 | DONNA ROTH | Tax Appraisal | Tax Appraisal | 202442921