Case Last Refreshed: 10 hours ago
Martens , Jimmy, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ghiselin Martens , Michelle, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts 419th District Court with Catherine A. Mauzy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCatherine A. Mauzy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 04, 2020 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House419th District Court |
ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: May 04, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | REPORTED TO VITAL STATISTICS | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER (Judicial Officer: MAUZY, CATHERINE A) AGREED FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | FMD:AGREED JUDGMENT (OCA) | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE STATEMENT OF EVIDENCE AND STIPULATION OF PROVE-UP FACTS | |
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE IRREVOCABLE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FOR FINAL ORDERS | |
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE RULE 11 AGREEMENT | |
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE RULE 11 AGREEMENT CONCERNING DISCOVERY DEADLINES | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE RULE 11 AGREEMENT CONCERNING DISCOVERY DEADLINES | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION MOTION FOR SCHEDULING ORDER | |
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER (Judicial Officer: MATHEWS RODRIGUEZ, LEIGH) AGREED TEMPORARY ORDERS REGARDING PUBLISHING IMAGES, VIDEOS OR LIKENESS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.