Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Taylor , Bonni, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Dunham David Erwin, against Landry , Madeline, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 02, 2020 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: November 02, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER (Judicial Officer: MARTINEZ JONES, AURORA) AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event | CVD:DISMISSAL/NONSUIT (OCA) | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION Agreed Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice Party: Plaintiff TAYLOR, BONNI | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION AGREED MOTION FOR ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER Event Code: 5265 Party: Plaintiff TAYLOR, BONNI | |
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL ANSWER/WAIVER DEFENDANT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER Event Code: 5150 Party: Defendant LANDRY, MADELINE | |
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SERVICE CITATION MADELEINE LANDRY Event Code: 4893 Party: Defendant LANDRY, MADELINE | |
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event | ASM:CITATION ISSUE Event Code: 702 Adjmt Amount: 8.00 Party: Plaintiff TAYLOR, BONNI | |
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event | ASM:GN CIVIL PETITION Event Code: 600 Adjmt Amount: 307.00 Party: Plaintiff TAYLOR, BONNI | |
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event | ASM:JURY FEE CIVIL Event Code: 938 Adjmt Amount: 40.00 Party: Plaintiff TAYLOR, BONNI | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE Event Code: 5050 Party: Plaintiff TAYLOR, BONNI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.