Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Fsc Vista Sureno Old California Associates Llc, filed a(n) Tax Appraisal - Tax case represented by Sessions Dallas Alford, against Travis Central Appraisal District, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 30, 2020 |
CategoryAppraisal Review |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeTax Appraisal |
ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: October 30, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | CVD:AGREED JUDGMENT (OCA) | |
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER (Judicial Officer: DOTY, CLEVE W) AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT Party: Plaintiff FSC VISTA SURENO/OLD CALIFORNIA ASSOCIATES LLC Party 2: Defendant TRAVIS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT | |
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION MOTION FOR SUBMISSION - AFJ Party: Defendant TRAVIS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | PLEADING PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED PETITION Event Code: 5054 Party: Plaintiff FSC VISTA SURENO/OLD CALIFORNIA ASSOCIATES LLC | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE RULE 11 AGREEMENT Event Code: 5415 | |
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL ANSWER/WAIVER DEFENDANTS ORIGINAL ANSWER Event Code: 5150 Party: Defendant TRAVIS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT | |
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SERVICE CITATION TRAVIS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT Event Code: 4893 Party: Defendant TRAVIS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT | |
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event | ASM:GN CIVIL PETITION Event Code: 600 Adjmt Amount: 307.00 Party: Plaintiff FSC VISTA SURENO/OLD CALIFORNIA ASSOCIATES LLC | |
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event | ASM:CITATION SERVICE CST5 Event Code: 830 Adjmt Amount: 80.00 Party: Plaintiff FSC VISTA SURENO/OLD CALIFORNIA ASSOCIATES LLC | |
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event | ASM:CITATION ISSUE Event Code: 702 Adjmt Amount: 8.00 Party: Plaintiff FSC VISTA SURENO/OLD CALIFORNIA ASSOCIATES LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.