Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Westdale On The Green Ltd, filed a(n) Tax Appraisal - Tax case represented by Blackwell Melinda D., against Travis Central Appraisal District, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 30, 2020 |
CategoryAppraisal Review |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeTax Appraisal |
ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: October 30, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER (Judicial Officer: LIVINGSTON, LORA) AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT Party: Plaintiff WESTDALE ON THE GREEN LTD Party 2: Defendant TRAVIS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | CVD:AGREED JUDGMENT (OCA) | |
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION MOTION FOR SUBMISSION Party: Defendant TRAVIS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT | |
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE RULE 11 AGREEMENT Event Code: 5415 | |
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE RULE 11 AGREEMENT Event Code: 5415 Party: Defendant TRAVIS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT | |
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY Event Code: 5415 Party: Plaintiff WESTDALE ON THE GREEN LTD | |
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL ANSWER/WAIVER DEFENDANT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER Event Code: 5150 Party: Defendant TRAVIS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT | |
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SERVICE CITATION TRAVIS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT Event Code: 4893 Party: Defendant TRAVIS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | ASM:CITATION SERVICE CST5 Event Code: 830 Adjmt Amount: 80.00 Party: Plaintiff WESTDALE ON THE GREEN LTD | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | ASM:GN CIVIL PETITION Event Code: 600 Adjmt Amount: 307.00 Party: Plaintiff WESTDALE ON THE GREEN LTD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.